Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter James Fitzgerald, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alaska

Titular Bishop of Tymbrias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1883BornPeola, WA
31 Jul 190420.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
16 May 191834.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 192238.2Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Dec 193855.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA
14 Dec 193855.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tymbrias
24 Feb 193955.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tymbrias
20 May 194561.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA
19 Jul 194763.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter James Fitzgerald:
Bishop Walter James Fitzgerald S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alaska

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 7
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015