Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Richard McNamara

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Risinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1927Born
10 Jan 195224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
14 Apr 199264.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
14 Apr 199264.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
21 May 199264.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
12 Oct 199972.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
16 Apr 200173.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Richard McNamara:
Bishop John Richard McNamara (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,681
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013