Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Glynn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Monteverde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1926BornBoston
11 Apr 195124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
10 Dec 199165.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
10 Dec 199165.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Monteverde
6 Jan 199265.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Monteverde
13 Aug 200276.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
23 Aug 200478.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Glynn:
Bishop John Joseph Glynn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of United States of America, Military

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,560
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013