Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Francis Kelleher

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Thenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1889BornCambridge, MA
3 Apr 191525.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 194555.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Apr 194555.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
8 Jun 194555.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
26 Nov 194657.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Francis Kelleher:
Bishop Louis Francis Kelleher (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013