Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Banks

Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1928 BornBoston
20 Dec 195224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Jun 198557.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
26 Jun 198557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Taraqua
19 Sep 198557.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taraqua
16 Oct 199062.6AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
5 Dec 199062.8InstalledBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
10 Oct 200375.6RetiredBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Banks:
Bishop Robert Joseph Banks (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Green Bay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Green Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013