Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Rodriguez Rodriguez, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1931Born
2 Aug 195322.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jun 195827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Jan 197442.8AppointedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
23 Mar 197442.9Ordained BishopBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
20 Mar 199058.9ResignedBishop of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
13 Aug 200170.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Arecibo, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Miguel Rodriguez Rodriguez:
Bishop Miguel Rodriguez Rodriguez C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arecibo

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013