Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edward (Jaime Eduardo) McManus, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1900BornBrooklyn, NY
2 Aug 192221.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Jun 192726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 May 194746.6AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
1 Jul 194746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
1 Aug 194746.8InstalledBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
18 Nov 196363.1ResignedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
18 Nov 196363.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
18 Nov 196363.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
10 Oct 197070.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Jul 197675.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ponce, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for James Edward (Jaime Eduardo) McManus:
Bishop James Edward (Jaime Eduardo) McManus C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1977
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013