Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mark Siegel

Bishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1963 Born
14 Apr 198824.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Joliet in Illinois, USA
4 Jun 198824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Joliet in Illinois, USA
28 Oct 200946.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
28 Oct 200946.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
19 Jan 201046.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
18 Oct 201754.2AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
15 Dec 201754.4InstalledBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mark Siegel
Bishop Joseph Mark Siegel (born ) Bishop of Evansville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoliet, Diocese of Joliet in Illinois
Ordained BishopSaint Raymond Nonnatus, Cathedral, Joliet, Diocese of Joliet in Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evansville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,556
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2017
  • i: CB, 18 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast