Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urban Eugen McGarry, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bhagalpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1910BornWarren, PA, USA
3 Oct 194231.9Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
195645.1AppointedPrefect of Bhagalpur, India
11 Jan 196554.2AppointedBishop of Bhagalpur, India
10 May 196554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bhagalpur, India
30 Nov 198777.0RetiredBishop of Bhagalpur, India
16 Sep 200089.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bhagalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Urban Eugen McGarry:
Bishop Urban Eugen McGarry T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bhagalpur

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013