Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mark Spalding

Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1965 Born
3 Aug 199126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
21 Nov 201752.8AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
2 Feb 201853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mark Spalding
Bishop Joseph Mark Spalding (born ) Bishop of Nashville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLebanon, Archdiocese of Louisville, Kentucky
Ordained BishopSagrado Corazon, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nashville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2017
  • fn/ob: CB, 21 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Feb 2018