Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Medley

Bishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1952 Born
22 May 198229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
15 Dec 200957.2AppointedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
10 Feb 201057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for William Francis Medley
Bishop William Francis Medley (born ) Bishop of Owensboro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoretto, KY

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Owensboro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018