Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Lawrence Adrian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1883BornSigourney, IA
15 Apr 191128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
6 Feb 193652.8AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
16 Apr 193653.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
4 Sep 196986.4RetiredBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
4 Sep 196986.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elo
13 Jan 197187.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Elo
13 Feb 197288.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for William Lawrence Adrian:
Bishop William Lawrence Adrian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nashville

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1972
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013