Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Joseph Finnigan, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Helena, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1885Born
13 Jun 191530.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
20 May 192742.2AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
1 Aug 192742.4Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
18 Aug 192742.4InstalledBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
14 Aug 193247.4DiedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for George Joseph Finnigan
Bishop George Joseph Finnigan C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Helena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalone, NY

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018