Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Scanlan

Deceased

Bishop of Salt Lake, Utah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1843BornBallytarsna, Ireland
28 Jun 186824.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
25 Jan 188743.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Utah, USA
25 Jan 188743.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
29 Jun 188743.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
30 Jan 189147.3AppointedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
10 May 191571.6DiedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Scanlan:
Bishop Lawrence Scanlan (born , died ) Bishop of Salt Lake

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 330, and Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013