Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gulstan Francis Ropert, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

Titular Bishop of Panopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1839Born
16 Jun 186121.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
26 May 186626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
3 Jun 189252.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA
3 Jun 189252.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Panopolis
25 Sep 189253.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panopolis
4 Jan 190363.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Gulstan Francis Ropert
Bishop Gulstan Francis Ropert SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hawaiian Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerfago, Diocese of Vannes, France
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018