Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Michael Mulvey

Bishop of Corpus Christi, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1949 BornHouston, TX
29 Jun 197525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Austin, Texas, USA
18 Jan 201060.4AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
25 Mar 201060.6Ordained BishopBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for William Michael Mulvey:
Bishop William Michael Mulvey (born ) Bishop of Corpus Christi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Corpus Christi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013