Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Manuel Escalante y Escalante, M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pando

Titular Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1906BornMérida, México
1 Feb 193124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
13 Jan 194336.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pando, Bolivia
13 Jan 194336.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
9 May 194336.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
6 Dec 196053.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Pando, Bolivia
14 Jun 196760.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pando, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Manuel Escalante y Escalante:
Bishop Alfonso Manuel Escalante y Escalante M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pando

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015