Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Felix Gaughan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gary, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1921Born
4 Nov 194524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Mar 195129.7IncardinatedPriest of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Apr 197553.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Apr 197553.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Taraqua
26 Jun 197554.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taraqua
24 Jul 198463.1AppointedBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
2 Oct 198463.3InstalledBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
1 Jun 199675.0RetiredBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
1 Oct 199978.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Gary, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Norbert Felix Gaughan (VIAF: 31100410)
Bishop Norbert Felix Gaughan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gary

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh
Ordained BishopHoly Sacrament, Cathedral, Greensburg, Diocese of Greensburg, Pennsylvania
Buried Place (Original)St. Emma, Monastery, near Greensburg, Diocese of Greensburg, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,728

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast