Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah O’Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1842Born
30 Jun 186826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
16 Jun 188543.3AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
20 Sep 188543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
10 Aug 189654.5DiedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah O’Sullivan
Bishop Jeremiah O’Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop of Mobile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKanturk, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Chapel, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017