Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore di Pietro, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1830Born
2 Jun 185928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jun 188857.9AppointedPrefect of British Honduras, Belize
14 Jan 189362.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
14 Jan 189362.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize
16 Apr 189362.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
23 Aug 189868.1DiedVicar Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize

MicroData Summary for Salvatore di Pietro
Bishop Salvatore di Pietro S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Honduras

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy
Ordained BishopHoly Redeemer, Pro-Cathderal, Belize, Vicariate Apostolic of British Honduras, Belize

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 265
  • b/ob/c2+: CB, 26 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017