Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Van de Vyver

Deceased

Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1844Born
24 Jul 187025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
16 Jul 188944.6AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
20 Oct 188944.8Ordained BishopBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
16 Oct 191166.8DiedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustine Van de Vyver
Bishop Augustine Van de Vyver (born , died ) Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaasdonk, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Richmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,889, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast