Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Dominic Ambrose Pellicer

Deceased

Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1824Born
15 Aug 185025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile, Alabama, USA
1 Sep 187449.7AppointedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 Dec 187450.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
27 Dec 187450.0InstalledBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
14 Apr 188055.3DiedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Dominic Ambrose Pellicer (VIAF: 46024768)
Bishop Anthony Dominic Ambrose Pellicer (born , died ) Bishop of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Augustine, FL
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Mobile, Diocese of Mobile, Alabama

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017