Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Howard Joseph Carroll

Deceased

Bishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1902BornPittsburgh
2 Apr 192724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Dec 195755.3AppointedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
2 Jan 195855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Mar 196057.6DiedBishop of Altoona-Johnstown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Howard Joseph Carroll:
Bishop Howard Joseph Carroll (born , died ) Bishop of Altoona-Johnstown

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013