Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Paul Elford

Deceased

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1922BornPittsburgh
11 Jun 194623.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
27 May 194724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
15 Jul 196845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
15 Jul 196845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Acropolis
Oct 196846.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
Oct 196846.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Acropolis
6 Feb 199168.4DiedFormer Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Paul Elford:
Priest John Paul Elford (born , died ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Fort Wayne-South Bend

  • a priest for 43.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013