Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Elmer Bernarding, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mount Hagen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1912BornCarrick, PA, USA
13 Aug 193927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Dec 195947.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
19 Dec 195947.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Belabitene
21 Apr 196048.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belabitene
15 Nov 196654.7AppointedBishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
18 Mar 198270.0AppointedArchbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
7 Mar 198775.0RetiredArchbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
21 Dec 198775.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for George Elmer Bernarding:
Archbishop George Elmer Bernarding S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mount Hagen

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015