Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mount Hagen

Archidioecesis Montis Hagensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Douglas William Young, S.V.D., Archbishop
  • Michael Meier, S.V.D., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 March 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 8,288 (3,201 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 54, Mount Hagen, W.H.P., 281 Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 54.21.285
  • Fax: 54.22.128

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mount Hagen
18 June 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen
Vicariate Apostolic of Wewak
Vicariate Apostolic of Mount Hagen (erected)
Diocese of Mount Hagen
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mount Hagen Diocese of Mount Hagen
18 March 1982Territory LostDiocese of Mount Hagen Diocese of Wabag (erected)
Archdiocese of Mount Hagen
18 March 1982ElevatedDiocese of Mount Hagen Archdiocese of Mount Hagen

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mount Hagen
197087,582318,00027.5%141422,085573832ap1971
1980128,673372,00034.6%442462,797625835ap1981
Archdiocese of Mount Hagen
1990107,146264,35440.5%426303,571543023ap1991
1999128,355328,85039.0%926353,667464623ap2000
2000129,979334,17038.9%1528433,022514123ap2001
2001131,708348,31137.8%1425393,377514723ap2002
2002135,487357,50037.9%1326393,474464823ap2003
2003140,197359,52639.0%1625413,419415323ap2004
2004142,725386,40836.9%1524393,659405223ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011