Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Douglas William Young, S.V.D.

Archbishop of Mount Hagen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1950 BornBrisbane, Australia
13 Aug 197727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
14 Apr 200050.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
14 Apr 200050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
2 Jul 200050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
17 Jul 200656.5AppointedArchbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Douglas William Young:
Archbishop Douglas William Young S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop of Mount Hagen

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mount Hagen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,805

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013