Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Houhou

Bishop-Elect of Auki, Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1966 Born
3 Jul 199932.7Ordained PriestPriest of Honiara, Solomon Islands
3 Jul 201851.7AppointedBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands
14 Oct 201852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Auki, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Peter Houhou
Father Peter Houhou (born ) Bishop-Elect of Auki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarau, Guadalcanal
Ordained BishopSt. Augustine, Cathedral, Auki, Diocese of Auki

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Auki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • c1: CB, 4 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 4 Sep 2018
  • c2+: CB, 11 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast