Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Tuigg

Deceased

Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

Apostolic Administrator of Allegheny, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1821BornDonoughmore, Ireland
14 May 185029.2Ordained PriestPriest of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jan 187654.8AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Mar 187655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Aug 187756.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Dec 188968.8DiedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Tuigg:
Bishop John Tuigg (born , died ) Bishop of Pittsburgh

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91, and Page 457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015