Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Francis Shanahan

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1834Born
3 Jul 185924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Mar 186833.6AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Jul 186833.9Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Sep 188652.1DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary
Jeremiah Francis Shanahan
Bishop Jeremiah Francis Shanahan
(born , died )
Bishop of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilver Lake, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Philadelphia, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Relatives
  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025