Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McGill

Deceased

Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1809Born
13 Jun 183525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
23 Jul 185040.7AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
10 Nov 185041.0Ordained BishopBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
6 Dec 185041.0InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
14 Jan 187262.1DiedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary
John McGill
Bishop John McGill
(born , died )
Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Bardstown, Diocese of Bardstown, Kentucky
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Bardstown, Diocese of Louisville, Kentucky
Death PlaceRichmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia
Buried Place (Original)Sacred Heart, Cathedral, Richmond, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 55
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c1: CB, 17 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025