Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marcel Pierre Auguste Vérot, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1805Born
20 Sep 182823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
11 Dec 185752.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Florida, USA
11 Dec 185752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
25 Apr 185852.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
3 Jun 185853.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of Florida, USA
23 Jul 186156.1AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
11 Mar 187064.8AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
10 Jun 187671.0DiedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Jean Marcel Pierre Auguste Vérot (VIAF: 224878927)
Bishop Jean Marcel Pierre Auguste Vérot P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Puy, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay, France, France
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 131, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017