Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Paul McCloskey

Deceased

Bishop of Jaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1870BornPhiladelphia, PA, USA
17 Dec 189828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Feb 191746.2AppointedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
1 May 191746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
8 Mar 192049.2AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
10 Apr 194574.3DiedBishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for James Paul McCloskey:
Bishop James Paul McCloskey (born , died ) Bishop of Jaro

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: LC
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c34: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013