Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel James Gercke

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona

Titular Archbishop of Cotyaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1874BornPhiladelphia
1 Jun 190126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Jun 192348.7AppointedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
6 Nov 192349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
28 Sep 196086.0RetiredBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
28 Sep 196086.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotyaeum
19 Mar 196489.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel James Gercke:
Archbishop Daniel James Gercke (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tucson

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013