Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Clos y Pagés, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamboanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1859BornPerelada, Spain
29 Jul 189435.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 May 192061.0AppointedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
17 Oct 192061.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
2 Aug 193172.2DiedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Clos y Pagés:
Bishop José Clos y Pagés S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Zamboanga

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015