Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Barlin Imperial

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1850BornBaŠo
19 Sep 187525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
14 Dec 190555.6AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
29 Jun 190656.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
4 Sep 190959.4DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jorge Barlin Imperial:
Bishop Jorge Barlin Imperial (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1906, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013