Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Alemany Grau, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1934 Born
11 Jan 195924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Aug 199561.5AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
15 Oct 199561.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
18 May 200066.3ResignedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Alemany Grau
Bishop José Ignacio Alemany Grau C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chachapoyas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chachapoyas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,622

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018