Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Anaya

Deceased

Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1839Born
18 Aug 186627.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cochabamba, Bolivia
19 Aug 186627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cochabamba, Bolivia
10 Sep 189758.0AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
20 Mar 189858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
17 Dec 191576.3DiedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Anaya
Bishop Jacinto Anaya (born , died ) Bishop of Cochabamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCochabamba, Diocese of Cochabamba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cochabamba, Diocese of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 213
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,898, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast