Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Michael Britt

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1944BornDetroit
28 Jun 197025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 199349.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 199349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
6 Jan 199449.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
10 Dec 200258.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
12 Feb 200358.2InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
13 Oct 200358.9SucceededBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
15 May 200459.5DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Kevin Michael Britt:
Bishop Kevin Michael Britt (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,199
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013