Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Fernández

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1935BornLa Habana, Cuba
17 May 195924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
23 Jun 199762.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
23 Jun 199762.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
3 Sep 199762.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
10 Dec 200267.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
30 Sep 201176.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Fernández:
Bishop Gilberto Fernández (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Miami

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,040
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015