Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Francis Lippert, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1957 Born
20 Aug 198326.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Jun 198527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Nov 201154.4AppointedBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea
4 Feb 201254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mendi, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Donald Francis Lippert
Bishop Donald Francis Lippert O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Mendi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mendi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 19 Dec 2011
  • c2: CB, 7 Jan 2012
  • c1: CB, 3 Feb 2012
  • c34: CB, 5 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018