Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Separy

Bishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1957 Born
17 Jun 199133.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wewak, Papua New Guinea
2 Jul 200749.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
2 Jul 200749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
30 Oct 200750.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
9 Jun 200951.8AppointedBishop of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
16 Jul 201961.9AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
25 Sep 201962.1InstalledBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Otto Separy
Bishop Otto Separy (born ) Bishop of Bereina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKubila
Ordained BishopSaint Ignatius Secondary School Basketball Court, Aitape, Diocese of Aitape

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bereina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,560
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2019
  • i: AM, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast