Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bereina

Dioecesis Bereinitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rochus Josef Tatamai, M.S.C., Bishop
  • Gérard-Joseph Deschamps, S.M.M., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Port Moresby
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 19,146 (7,395 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 300, Boroko, N.C.D. 111, Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 32.56.102
  • Fax: 32.56.103

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Yule Island
16 July 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Vicariate Apostolic of Yule Island (erected)
Diocese of Bereina
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yule Island Diocese of Bereina
16 January 1971Territory LostDiocese of Bereina
Diocese of Mendi
Diocese of Kerema (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bereina
197040,511105,49538.4%74350810648521ap1971
198041,98352,58679.8%528331,2723474413ap1981
199053,56364,91982.5%521262,0602345016ap1991
199962,65680,00078.3%710173,6851163514ap2000
200064,53680,00080.7%711183,5851192614ap2001
200166,15681,50681.2%710173,8911182614ap2002
200267,04882,84880.9%811193,5282152614ap2003
200367,93383,73381.1%712193,5752172414ap2004
200467,93383,73381.1%712193,5751152314ap2005
200669,00086,50079.8%912213,2851142514ap2007
201284,00097,14186.5%913223,8181172313ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013