Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard-Joseph Deschamps, S.M.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Bereina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1929 BornEastview, Canada
13 Mar 195424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
17 Oct 196132.2AppointedPrefect of Daru, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 196637.3AppointedBishop of Daru, Papua New Guinea
21 Jan 196737.5Ordained BishopBishop of Daru, Papua New Guinea
2 Jan 199969.4AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
12 Feb 200272.6ResignedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Gérard-Joseph Deschamps:
Bishop Gérard-Joseph Deschamps S.M.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bereina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bereina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015