Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Daru-Kiunga

Dioecesis Daruensis-Kiunganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gilles Côté, S.M.M., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 4 September 1987
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Port Moresby
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 99,600 (38,470 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 42, Kiunga, W.P. 335, Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 5481.078
  • Fax: 5481.050

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Daru
16 July 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Prefecture Apostolic of Daru (erected)
Diocese of Daru
15 November 1966ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Daru Diocese of Daru
Diocese of Daru-Kiunga
4 September 1987Name ChangedDiocese of Daru Diocese of Daru-Kiunga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Daru
19702,21561,2613.6%141415822327ap1971
19806,51883,4007.8%131350126328ap1981
Diocese of Daru-Kiunga
199021,37193,00023.0%49131,643243111ap1991
199931,096112,00027.8%87152,073113510ap2000
200032,514114,50028.4%59142,322133212ap2001
200133,990116,00029.3%106162,124113713ap2002
200234,995152,06723.0%510152,333163913ap2003
200336,158153,00023.6%411152,4101173513ap2004
200437,109153,24724.2%412162,3191183512ap2005
200638,859157,60024.7%520251,554313812ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011