Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vitus Bouma, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prefect of Banka e Biliton


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1892BornOude-Mirdum, Netherlands
27 Jan 191522.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
18 Mar 191825.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
11 Mar 192330.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 May 192835.4AppointedPrefect of Banka e Biliton, Indonesia
19 Apr 194552.3DiedPrefect of Banka e Biliton, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Vitus Bouma:
Father Vitus Bouma SS.CC. (born , died ) Prefect of Banka e Biliton

  • a priest for 22.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015