Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcisius Henricus Josephus van Valenberg, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pontianak, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Comba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1890Born
6 Jun 191424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Dec 193444.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}, Indonesia
10 Dec 193444.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Comba
5 May 193545.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comba
13 Jul 195767.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Pontianak, Indonesia
18 Dec 198494.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pontianak, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Tarcisius Henricus Josephus van Valenberg
Bishop Tarcisius Henricus Josephus van Valenberg O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pontianak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsten

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1985
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018