Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Herculanus Joannes Maria van der Burgt, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1910Born
21 Sep 193525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Jul 195747.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pontianak, Indonesia
13 Jul 195747.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
27 Oct 195747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
3 Jan 196150.5AppointedArchbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia
2 Jul 197666.0DiedArchbishop of Pontianak, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Herculanus Joannes Maria van der Burgt
Archbishop Herculanus Joannes Maria van der Burgt O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Pontianak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOverasselt

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018