Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelmus Joannes (Guillaume Jean) Demarteau, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1917BornHorn, Netherlands
27 Jul 194124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
6 Jan 195436.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bandjarmasin, Indonesia
6 Jan 195436.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Cypro
5 May 195437.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Cypro
3 Jan 196143.9AppointedBishop of Bandjarmasin, Indonesia
6 Jun 198366.3ResignedBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia
5 Dec 201295.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus Joannes (Guillaume Jean) Demarteau:
Bishop Wilhelmus Joannes (Guillaume Jean) Demarteau M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin

  • a priest for 71.3 years
  • a bishop for 58.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: CB, 5 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015