Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yulius Aloysius Husin, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Palangkaraya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1937BornAsa
25 Jul 196426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
5 Apr 199355.6AppointedBishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia
17 Oct 199356.2Ordained BishopBishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia
13 Oct 199457.2DiedBishop of Palangkaraya, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Yulius Aloysius Husin:
Bishop Yulius Aloysius Husin M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Palangkaraya

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,336
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013